De Los Santos v. Sun Loan Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adan De Los Santos
Defendant: Sun Loan Company, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00190
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 6/18/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2019, Discovery due by 2/14/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 9/18/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2020. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Recommendations by Adan De Los Santos. (Radbil, Aaron)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney David Clay Snell added to party Sun Loan Company, Inc.(pty:dft) by Sun Loan Company, Inc..(Snell, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adan De Los Santos. Sun Loan Company, Inc. served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Radbil, Aaron)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sun Loan Company, Inc. (aej)
February 26, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Adan De Los Santos. (Radbil, Aaron)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11812781), filed by Adan De Los Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radbil, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Los Santos v. Sun Loan Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Loan Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Clay Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan De Los Santos
Represented By: Aaron D. Radbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?