LeJeune v. Mammoth Energy Services, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Ej LeJeune, Israel Diaz, Julio Lopez Rios, Henry Torres Villegas, Jose A. Reyes Diaz, Wilfredo Sanchez and Luis M. Rodriguez
Defendant: Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. d/b/a Cobra Energy, Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC and Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00286
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. answer due 5/16/2019. (rg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC (Wills, Linda)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #24 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline to respond to the complaint is May 16, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
May 2, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT "EJ LEJEUNE" HAS BEEN ADDED AS A FILER OF THIS DOCUMENT***re #24 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Compel Arbitration, Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond. (rf)
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Compel Arbitration, Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by Mammoth Energy Services, Inc., EJ LeJune. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Brian) Modified on 5/2/2019, to add filer (rf).
April 30, 2019 Filing 23 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ej LeJeune, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC (Burch, Richard)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua K. Sekoski. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
April 24, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Glenn Patterson Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joshua K. Sekoski ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12037634) by on behalf of Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.. (Patterson, Brian)
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Glenn Patterson on behalf of Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.. Attorney Brian Glenn Patterson added to party Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Patterson, Brian)
April 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Nathan Prihoda as additional counsel by Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC (Wills, Linda)
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Incorrect case number or case style listed on document filed. re #17 Notice (Other) (mgr)
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing FLSA Consent Form by Ej LeJeune (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Form)(Fitapelli, Joseph)
April 22, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT***NOTICE of Appearance of Nathan Prihoda as additional counsel by Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC (Wills, Linda) Modified on 4/23/2019 (mgr).
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Elvia E. Hague as additional counsel by Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC (Wills, Linda)
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing FLSA Consent Forms by Ej LeJeune (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Forms)(Fitapelli, Joseph)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Parties by Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC. (Wills, Linda)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement by Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wills, Linda)
April 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. answer due 5/2/2019. (mgr)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline to file an answer of otherwise respond to the complaint is May 2, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Brian)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph A. Fitapelli. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Armando A. Ortiz. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard J. Burch for Joseph A. Fitapelli ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11968139) by on behalf of Ej LeJeune. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burch, Richard)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard J. Burch for Armando A. Ortiz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11968036) by on behalf of Ej LeJeune. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burch, Richard)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ej LeJeune. Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Schreiber, Richard)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Israel Diaz, Jose A. Reyes Diaz, Ej LeJeune, Julio Lopez Rios, Luis M. Rodriguez, Wilfredo Sanchez, Henry Torres Villegas (Schreiber, Richard)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Filing Notices of Consent by Ej LeJeune (Josephson, Michael)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notices of Consent by Ej LeJeune (Josephson, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ej LeJeune. Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. (Josephson, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
March 20, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
March 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ej LeJeune. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Mammoth)(Josephson, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11898310), filed by Ej LeJeune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeJeune v. Mammoth Energy Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mammoth Energy Services, Inc. d/b/a Cobra Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Espada Logistics and Security Group, LLC
Represented By: Linda P. Wills
Represented By: Elvia E. Hague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Glenn Patterson
Represented By: Joshua K. Sekoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ej LeJeune
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Armando A. Ortiz
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Diaz
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Armando A. Ortiz
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Lopez Rios
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Armando A. Ortiz
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Torres Villegas
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Armando A. Ortiz
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Reyes Diaz
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Armando A. Ortiz
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Sanchez
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Armando A. Ortiz
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis M. Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Armando A. Ortiz
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?