Hinkley et al v. Envoy Air Inc.
Plaintiff: John Hinkley and Steve Rice
Counter Plaintiff: Envoy Air Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00340
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 27 Pro Hac Vice Letters. (aej)
April 3, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
April 3, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
April 3, 2019 Filing 26 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of Texas; Case Number 4:19-cv-00014.
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Transferring to Another District: The court ORDERS that the above-captioned action be, and is hereby, transferred to the San Antonio Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/2/2019) (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by John Hinkley, Steve Rice re: #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 23 COUNTERCLAIM against John Hinkley, Steve Rice filed by Envoy Air Inc. (wrb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 Brief in Support filed by Envoy Air Inc. re #21 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (wrb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Envoy Air Inc. (wrb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Envoy Air Inc. filed by Steve Rice, John Hinkley. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart Shaffer. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/21/2019) (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Sisam. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/21/2019) (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The court ORDERS that plaintiffs' motion #14 be, and is hereby, granted, and Sisam and Shaffer be, and are hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00 p.m. on February 15, 2019, in which to file applications for admission pro hac vice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/14/2019) (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Stuart Shaffer (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032177) filed by John Hinkley, Steve Rice (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Joshua H Sisam (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032177) filed by John Hinkley, Steve Rice (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Leave for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Applications filed by John Hinkley, Steve Rice. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance as Local Counsel by Kirk Matthew Claunch on behalf of John Hinkley, Steve Rice. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR REPLEADING: The court ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on February 21, 2019, plaintiffs file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint" in compliance with the pleading requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure' and the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the judge-specific requirements of the undersigned; and that by 4:00 p.m. on March 7, 2019, defendant file an answer or other response to such Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in compliance with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the judge-specific requirements of the undersigned. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/7/2019) (mpw) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart Shaffer. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/1/2019) (mpw) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Stuart Shaffer (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by John Hinkley, Steve Rice (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff Steven Rice and John Hinkley's General Denial to Defendant's Counterclaim filed by John Hinkley, Steve Rice. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Jan 31 09:54:10 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Unfiling #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9738488) filed by Envoy Air Inc. due to the following deficiency: [n)o document will be filed in any case on the docket of the undersigned by electronic means; and, all documents filed in any case on the docket of the undersigned shall be in traditional paper form. The court further ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on February 13, 2019, plaintiffs file an appropriate written designation of local counsel. The court further ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on February 13, 2019, Shaffer and Sisam take the steps necessary to become admitted to practice before this court. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/30/2019) (bdb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #8 ***Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9738488) filed by Envoy Air Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Stuart Andrew Shaffer added to party Envoy Air Inc.(pty:dft) (Shaffer, Stuart) Modified on 1/31/2019 (edm). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Support filed by Envoy Air Inc. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss. (mpw) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Envoy Air Inc. (mpw) Modified on 2/26/2019 (edm) Termed per LC request [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of document #1 received. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Tue Jan 8 08:37:24 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/8/2019) (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (see doc #1 ) by Envoy Air Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate American Airlines Group for Envoy Air Inc. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 451st District Court, Kendall County, case number 18-656 filed by Envoy Air Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9690040) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s)) (Hedrick, Lindsay) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinkley et al v. Envoy Air Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hinkley
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Claunch
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Shaffer
Represented By: Joshua H. Sisam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Rice
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Claunch
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Shaffer
Represented By: Joshua H. Sisam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Envoy Air Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay A Hedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?