Araiza v. Moreno, et al
Plaintiff: David Araiza
Defendant: Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company and Bella Moreno
Case Number: 5:2019cv00462
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company. (Rodriguez, Luis)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Incorrect case number or case style listed on document filed. re #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven G. Marquez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12239091) (mgr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company. (Rodriguez, Luis)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -WRONG CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT*** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven G. Marquez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12239091) by on behalf of David Araiza. (Marquez, Steven) Modified on 6/18/2019 (mgr).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) andLocal Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Failure to do so may result in the Court's entering its own scheduling order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr) Modified on 6/13/2019, to edit text (mgr).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company. (Rodriguez, Luis)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to attorney Charles J. Miler regarding admission into the Western District of Texas.(bc)
May 3, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
May 3, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12072005), filed by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Appendix Index of Documents, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P)(Rodriguez, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Araiza v. Moreno, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Araiza
Represented By: Thomas J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company
Represented By: Luis R. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?