Ricardo Trevino, et al v. Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Ricardo Olivarez, Jr., Ricardo Trevino and Joe Derrick Silos
Defendant: Eddie Aguilar and Colt Oilfield Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00474
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Sealed Motion filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (rg)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Joint Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order) (Fletcher, Melissa)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Sealed Motion filed. (rg) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/7/2019) (rg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2019: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document) (rg).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Joint Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order) (Fletcher, Melissa)
May 6, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12078215). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ricardo Trevino, Ricardo Olivarez, Jr., Joe Derrick Silos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buenker, Josef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricardo Trevino, et al v. Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Olivarez, Jr.
Represented By: Vijay Anand Pattisapu
Represented By: Josef F. Buenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Trevino
Represented By: Vijay Anand Pattisapu
Represented By: Josef F. Buenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Derrick Silos
Represented By: Vijay Anand Pattisapu
Represented By: Josef F. Buenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Aguilar
Represented By: Melissa Morales Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Oilfield Services, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Morales Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?