Atkinson v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Roxanne Atkinson
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Lisa McElroy
Case Number: 5:2019cv00482
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Baker, Brittany)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal Under Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Brittany)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, re #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Roxanne Atkinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baker, Brittany)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Roxanne Atkinson, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal Under Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Westlund, R.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Roxanne Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Westlund, R.)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal Under Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baker, Brittany)
May 6, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12079481), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Baker, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkinson v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Atkinson
Represented By: Joshua S. Hatley
Represented By: R. Scott Westlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittany Marie Baker
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?