Zuniga v. Davis
Petitioner: Zidney Zuniga
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00487
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Lorie Davis answer due 8/5/2019. (rg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief in Support by Lorie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Goettert, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond/Answer (Docket Entry 10) entered by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Respondent's deadline to response/answer Petitioner's Writ of Habeas Corpus (Docket Entry 1) is EXTENDED to AUGUST 5, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court.(wb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief in Support by Lorie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Goettert, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lorie Davis. (Goettert, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth A. Goettert on behalf of Lorie Davis. Attorney Elizabeth A. Goettert added to party Lorie Davis(pty:res) (Goettert, Elizabeth)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Zidney Zuniga. (wg)
May 30, 2019 Remark: Copy of Habeas Petition and Order to Answer were forwarded Via E-Mail to Respondents, Edward L. Marshall & Laura Haney. (wg)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Zidney Zuniga. Respondent must answer Petition within (30) Days after receiving this Order. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order and Habeas Corpus Petition Via E-mail to the attention of Edward L. Marshal & Laura Haney. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(wg)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING re #4 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zidney Zuniga. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 PRO-SE MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zidney Zuniga.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg)
May 9, 2019 Remark: Copy of Order & IFP Application was forwarded to the Petitioner at last listed address. (wg)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER, Petitioner has NOT paid the Filing Fee, or Filed a Completed IFP Application. It is Ordered that Petitioner within (30) days of the filing of this Order, file a Completed IFP Application with Inmate Statement, or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Failure to comply may result in the Dismissal of the Petitioners case. The District Clerk shall send a Blank Standard IFP Application. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Zidney Zuniga. (dtg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Zidney Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(dtg)
May 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (dtg)
May 3, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuniga v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Goettert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zidney Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?