White-Conlee Builders, Ltd v. United Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: White-Conlee Builders, Ltd
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00489
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/23/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019, Discovery due by 7/30/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 11/15/2019, Motions due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Scheduling Recommendations by United Fire & Casualty Company. (Mitchell, Aaron)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
May 8, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
May 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet by United Fire & Casualty Company. (Mitchell, Aaron)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Fire & Casualty Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12089293), filed by United Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White-Conlee Builders, Ltd v. United Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White-Conlee Builders, Ltd
Represented By: Barry Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Aaron Linzy Mitchell
Represented By: Lori J. Murphy
Represented By: Matthew Rigney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?