Virani v. Huron et al
Petitioner: Malik Akbarbhai Virani
Respondent: Daniel A. Bible, Andrew Huron, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, The Department of Homeland Security and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 5:2019cv00499
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss And/Or, In the Alternative, For Summary Judgment by Daniel A. Bible, Andrew Huron, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin McAleenan, The Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (McAndrew, Lacy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Malik Akbarbhai Virani. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Tab A, #2 Appendix Tab B, #3 Appendix Tab C)(Azar-Farr, Simon)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Certified Mail Receipt RETURN of #9 Order on Motion to Expedite, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (aej)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Certified Mail Receipt RETURN of #9 Order on Motion to Expedite, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (aej)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipt of #9 Order on Motion to Expedite, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (aej)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 RETURNED Certified Mail Receipt for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (bc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 ***ORDER STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER #9***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malik Akbarbhai Virani. Andrew Huron served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Azar-Farr, Simon) Modified on 6/3/2019 (aej).
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Habeas Pleading Timeline by Malik Akbarbhai Virani.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Azar-Farr, Simon)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus sent to John F. Paniszczyn. (bc)
May 13, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***SUMMONS WERE ISSUED PREMATURELY AND A SERVICE ORDER WILL BE ISSUED.*** re 2 Summons Issued as to USA. (bc)
May 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ***ORDER STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER #9***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malik Akbarbhai Virani. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Azar-Farr, Simon) Modified on 6/3/2019 (aej).
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 ***ORDER STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER #9***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malik Akbarbhai Virani. Daniel A. Bible served on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Azar-Farr, Simon) Modified on 6/3/2019 (aej).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Exhibits Tab A - Tab B ( Filing fee $ 5.00; receipt number 500049227), filed by Malik Akbarbhai Virani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab C - Tab H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt of FIling Fee)(bc)
May 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney (bc)
May 10, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virani v. Huron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel A. Bible
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Huron
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malik Akbarbhai Virani
Represented By: Simon M. Azar-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?