Moreno et al v. TaskUS USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Ryan Mosel and Sergio Moreno
Defendant: TaskUS USA, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00504
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Joint Motion to Stay Case Pending Arbitration. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this lawsuit is stayed pending the outcome of the arbitration proceeding entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by TaskUS USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rector, Jonathan)
June 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines: TaskUS USA, LLC answer due 6/21/2019. (rg)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant TaskUs USA, LLC shall have until June 21, 2019, to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint [Dkt. 1]entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by TaskUS USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rector, Jonathan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sergio Moreno, Ryan Mosel. TaskUS USA, LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Hartry, Allison)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TaskUS USA, LLC. (bc)
May 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sergio Moreno, Ryan Mosel. (Morales, Lawrence)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12102249), filed by Sergio Moreno, Ryan Mosel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mosel Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit Moreno Consent to Join, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morales, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno et al v. TaskUS USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Mosel
Represented By: Lawrence Morales, II
Represented By: Allison Sarah Hartry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Moreno
Represented By: Lawrence Morales, II
Represented By: Allison Sarah Hartry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TaskUS USA, LLC
Represented By: Andrew R. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?