Torres v. Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Plaintiff: Sonia Torres
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00510
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF STAY-- The parties shall submit their stipulation of dismissal and any appropriate supporting documents on or before February 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER--It is hereby ORDERED that the above-entitled and numbered cause is RETURNED to the District Court for all purposes. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
January 7, 2021 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO ADD THE JOINT FILER*** re #48 Status Report. (bc)
January 6, 2021 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report by Greystar Management Services and Sonia Torres) by Greystar Management Services, L.P. and Sonia Torres. (Adams, Sarah) Modified on 1/7/2021 To edit text. (bc).
October 8, 2020 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report by Greystar Management Services and Sonia Torres) by Greystar Management Services, L.P. and Sonia Torres. (Adams, Sarah) Modified on 10/9/2020 To edit text (bc).
July 13, 2020 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO ADD THE JOINT FILER*** re #46 Status Report. (bc)
July 10, 2020 Filing 46 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sonia Torres and Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Wilkerson, Jonathan) Modified on 7/13/2020 To edit text (bc).
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, ( Status Report due by 7/10/2020,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - The Clerks office is thereforeDIRECTED to administratively close this case pending further order of the Court. Though administratively closed, this case will still exist on the docket of this Court and may be reopened upon request or on the Courts own motion. Parties may continue to file motions and documents in the case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re #36 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Order (docket no. 36) of United States Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad, dated January 23, 2020, is AFFIRMED without modification. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
February 28, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S SURREPLY to #41 Response by Sonia Torres. (Lanier, W.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE (Defendant's Surreply to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate's Order of January 23, 2020) to #37 Miscellaneous Objection by Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Adams, Sarah)
February 20, 2020 Filing 40 Miscellaneous Objection to #36 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of Objections to Magistrate's Order of January 23, 2020 by Sonia Torres. (Lanier, W.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #37 Miscellaneous Objection by Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Adams, Sarah)
February 12, 2020 Filing 38 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 1/23/2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion for Reconsideration. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, email: gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/4/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2020, (gs)
February 6, 2020 Filing 37 Miscellaneous Objection to #36 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, by Sonia Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanier, W.)
January 23, 2020 Filing 36 GRANTED IN PART AND HELD IN ABEYANCE IN PART #16 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING IN PART #27 Motion for Reconsideration. Therefore, the Court's October 25, 2019, ruling on Defendant's Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint (Docket Entry 16) is WITHDRAWN. Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's class claims is HELD IN ABEYANCE. Further proceedings in this case remain STAYED pending arbitration in this case. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2020 re #27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint filed by Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(bc)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Hearing on #27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 2:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Greystar Management Services, L.P., re #27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Adams, Sarah)
November 14, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Sonia Torres, re #27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Lanier, W.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order (corrected) to #27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint by Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Adams, Sarah)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion to Stay. Such that the deadline to appeal theMagistrate Judges Order (docket no. 25) is STAYED until fourteen days after service of the Magistrate Judges entry of an Order on Defendants Motion for Reconsideration (Docket no. 27). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE DO NOT REFILE THE ENTIRE MOTION, PLEASE JUST FILE THE PROPOSED ORDER AS AN ATTACHMENT AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION*** re #27 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint (bc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay Deadline to Appeal Order by Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Adams, Sarah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint by Greystar Management Services, L.P... Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Adams, Sarah) Modified on 11/12/2019 To edit text(bc).
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 10/25/2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chris Poage, Telephone number: 210-244-5036 Email: chris_poage@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/19/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020, (cp)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and HELD IN ABEYANCE IN PART re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Greystar Management Services, L.P.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2019 re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(bc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Adams, Sarah)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Greystar Management Services, L.P., re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Adams, Sarah)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Hearing on #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. Referral Magistrate Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Assignment of Magistrate Judge. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Sonia Torres, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Lanier, W.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ford, #2 Affidavit Sheu, #3 Affidavit Lazarin, #4 Affidavit Reinke, #5 Affidavit Adams)(Adams, Sarah)
August 26, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Mark Lanier for Gregory F. Coleman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12311784) (aej)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 , #13 , #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth L. Woods,Samuel Levin,Sarah M. Adams for Greystar Management Services, L.P. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen A. Calhoun for Elizabeth L. Woods ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12500674) by on behalf of Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Calhoun, Stephen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen A. Calhoun for Samuel Levin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12500656) by on behalf of Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Calhoun, Stephen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen A. Calhoun for Sarah M. Adams ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12500627) by on behalf of Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Adams Order)(Calhoun, Stephen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sonia Torres as to Greystar Management Services, L.P.. Waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Lanier, W.)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Arthur Stock for Sonia Torres. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Mark Lanier for Arthur Stock ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12367656) by on behalf of Sonia Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanier, W.)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory F. Coleman,Ryan McMillan for Sonia Torres,Gregory F. Coleman,Ryan McMillan,Gregory F. Coleman,Ryan McMillan for Sonia Torres. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory F. Coleman,Ryan McMillan for Sonia Torres,Gregory F. Coleman,Ryan McMillan,Gregory F. Coleman,Ryan McMillan for Sonia Torres. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Mark Lanier for Ryan McMillan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12311859) by on behalf of Sonia Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanier, W.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Mark Lanier for Gregory F. Coleman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12311784) by on behalf of Sonia Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanier, W.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alex J. Brown,Jordan M. Lewis for Sonia Torres,Alex J. Brown,Jordan M. Lewis,Alex J. Brown,Jordan M. Lewis for Sonia Torres. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alex J. Brown,Jordan M. Lewis for Sonia Torres,Alex J. Brown,Jordan M. Lewis,Alex J. Brown,Jordan M. Lewis for Sonia Torres. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Mark Lanier for Jordan M. Lewis ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12167069) by on behalf of Sonia Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanier, W.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Mark Lanier on behalf of Alex J. Brown ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12136063) by on behalf of Sonia Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanier, W.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letters. (aej)
May 14, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
May 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12107629). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Sonia Torres. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lanier, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Samuel Levin
Represented By: Julia Wommack Mann
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Woods
Represented By: Jonathan D. Neerman
Represented By: Stephen A. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Torres
Represented By: W. Mark Lanier
Represented By: Jordan M. Lewis
Represented By: Alex J. Brown
Represented By: Ryan McMillan
Represented By: Jonathan P. Wilkerson
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?