Salazar Vasquez v. Quiroga Mancha

Petitioner: Israel Salazar Vasquez
Respondent: Gabriela Michelle Quiroga Mancha
Case Number: 5:2019cv00523
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Israel Salazar Vasquez. Gabriela Michelle Quiroga Mancha served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Caswell, Gary)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO APPEAR FOR SHOW CAUSE HEARING and ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER, GRANTING #20 MOTION to reissued Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order filed by Israel Salazar Vasquez. (Show Cause Hearing set for 7/22/2019 2:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez)The Court GRANTS Petitioner's Motion for Service by Private Process Server. Costs of service will be borne by Petitioner. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Gabriela Michelle Quiroga Mancha. (rg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Israel Salazar Vasquez. Corrected Request for Issuance of Summons (Caswell, Gary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 Sealed Document filed. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document A, #2 Sealed Document B, #3 Sealed Document C, #4 Sealed Document D, #5 Sealed Document E, #6 Sealed Document F, #7 Sealed Document G, #8 Sealed Document H, #9 Sealed Document I) (rg)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Corrected First Amended Verified Petition for Return of Children, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit B, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit C, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit D, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit E, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit F, #8 Sealed Document Exhibit G, #9 Sealed Document Exhibit H, #10 Sealed Document Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order) (Caswell, Gary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 Motion for Re-Issuance of Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caswell, Gary) Modified on 7/8/2019 (rg).
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST for Summons (Caswell, Gary) Modified on 7/8/2019 (rg).
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Gary Caswell The document filed is not the "Motion for Leave to File" but the Amended Complaint. Please file the Motion. re #17 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (rg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - See Deficiency Notice #18. Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (Caswell, Gary) Modified on 7/3/2019 (rg).
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Israel Salazar Vasquez as to Gabriela Michelle Quiroga Mancha. (rg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/18/2019. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(rg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Gabriela Michelle Quiroga Mancha. (rg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Gabriela Michelle Quiroga Mancha. (rg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Israel Salazar Vasquez. (Caswell, Gary)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING, and ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHALS, (Show Cause Hearing set for 6/18/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Initial Hearing on Hague Case held on 6/3/2019. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(rg)
May 17, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Hearing set for 6/3/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg) Modified on 5/20/2019 (rg).
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gabriela Michelle Quiroga Mancha. (bc)
May 16, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
May 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Israel Salazar Vasquez. (Caswell, Gary)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12120313), filed by Israel Salazar Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hague Application to Return Children to Mexico, #2 Exhibit TFC 105.001, #3 Exhibit Attorney Certification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caswell, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar Vasquez v. Quiroga Mancha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Israel Salazar Vasquez
Represented By: Gary Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gabriela Michelle Quiroga Mancha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?