Field v. Vital Recovery Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Field
Defendant: Audi Financial Services and Vital Recovery Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00559
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant VW Credit, Inc. d/b/a Audi Financial Services' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Audi Financial Services.(Chandler, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2019 Reset Answer Deadlines: All Defendants. (aej)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Responsive pleading due on or before July 22, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by Vital Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal & Substitution of Counsel)(Chandler, Elizabeth)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Audi Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV on behalf of Vital Recovery Services, LLC. Attorney Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV added to party Vital Recovery Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Martin, Eugene)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jin Seock Shin on behalf of Vital Recovery Services, LLC. Attorney Jin Seock Shin added to party Vital Recovery Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Shin, Jin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties by Vital Recovery Services, LLC. (Malone, Robbie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Robbie Malone added to party Vital Recovery Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Vital Recovery Services, LLC.(Malone, Robbie)
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Audi Financial Services answer due 7/8/2019; Vital Recovery Services, LLC answer due 7/8/2019. (aej)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Responsive pleading due on or before July 8, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Audi Financial Services. (Chandler, Elizabeth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Field. Vital Recovery Services, LLC served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Ladwig, Ramona)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Field. Audi Financial Services served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Ladwig, Ramona)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vital Recovery Services, LLC. (aej)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Audi Financial Services. (aej)
May 24, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (aej)
May 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jason Field. (Ladwig, Ramona)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12152195), filed by Jason Field. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ladwig, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Field v. Vital Recovery Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi Financial Services
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Chandler
Represented By: Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Represented By: Robbie Malone
Represented By: Jin Seock Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Field
Represented By: Ramona Veronica Ladwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?