Nettles v. Davis
Petitioner: Milton Wayne Nettles
Respondent: Judge Catherine Torres-Stahl, District Clerk's Office Criminal Section and Lorie Davis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00571
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Milton Wayne Nettles.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Letter/Correspondence from Milton Wayne Nettles. (mgr)
July 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Lorie Davis answer due 8/5/2019. (mgr)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer (Docket Entry 11) entered by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Respondent's deadline to respond/answer Petitioner's Petition is EXTENDED to AUGUST 5, 2019. This is a text-only entry made by the court. (wb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief in Support by Lorie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Greene, Garrett)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lorie Davis. (Greene, Garrett)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garrett Mitchell Greene on behalf of Lorie Davis. Attorney Garrett Mitchell Greene added to party Lorie Davis(pty:res) (Greene, Garrett)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Milton Wayne Nettles. (mgr)
June 5, 2019 Regenerated all documents to Respondent. (mgr)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 consent form)(mgr)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #4 Motion to Suppress the rules Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
May 29, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Suppress Rules Appellate #2 by Milton Wayne Nettles.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Milton Wayne Nettles.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Milton Wayne Nettles. (mgr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Milton Wayne Nettles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 copy of envelope)(mgr)
May 28, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (mgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nettles v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Milton Wayne Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Judge Catherine Torres-Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: District Clerk's Office Criminal Section
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Garrett Mitchell Greene
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?