Quintero v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Maria Quintero
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Donald Batchelor, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Donald Batchelor
Case Number: 5:2019cv00572
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 Donald Batchelor's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's State Court Petition by Donald Batchelor.(Valdez, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Donald Batchelor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Valdez, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Quintero. as of May 31, 2019 answer due 6/21/2019. (Fitts, Bryant) Modified on 7/24/2019, to edit text (mgr).
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order - Agreed by Maria Quintero. (Fitts, Bryant)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Maria Quintero, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company Bryant Fitts (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fitts, Bryant)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Valdez, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Valdez, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
May 28, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
May 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Donald Batchelor (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12160449), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Donald Batchelor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Valdez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Quintero
Represented By: Bryant A. Fitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Donald Batchelor
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Batchelor
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?