Time Insurance Company II v. Bahamonde et al
Plaintiff: Time Insurance Company II
Defendant: Jeanene Bahamonde and Ramona De Hoyos
Case Number: 5:2019cv00610
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Ramona De Hoyos' ANSWER to #1 Complaint in Interpleader. Attorney Jeremy R. Gilbreath added to party Ramona De Hoyos(pty:dft) by Ramona De Hoyos.(Gilbreath, Jeremy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Brett T. Reynolds added to party Jeanene Bahamonde(pty:dft) by Jeanene Bahamonde.(Reynolds, Brett)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DEPOSIT OF DEATH BENEFIT. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Time Insurance Company II as to Ramona De Hoyos. Waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Seybold, Steven)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Deposit Funds (Death Benefit) by Time Insurance Company II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seybold, Steven)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Jeanene Bahamonde. (aej)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Jeanene Bahamonde, Jeanene Bahamonde answer due 7/22/2019.The Clerk shall enter the Defts. address into the record and mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiffs known address. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Jeanene Bahamonde. (aej)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ramona De Hoyos. (aej)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Time Insurance Company II. (Seybold, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ramona De Hoyos. (aej)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jeanene Bahamonde. (aej)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Time Insurance Company II. (Seybold, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Time Insurance Company II. (Seybold, Steven)
June 5, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
June 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12192421). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Time Insurance Company II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlaud, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Time Insurance Company II v. Bahamonde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Time Insurance Company II
Represented By: Paul Schlaud
Represented By: Steven D. Seybold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanene Bahamonde
Represented By: Brett T. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona De Hoyos
Represented By: Jeremy R. Gilbreath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?