Lytle v. The Hertz Corporation

Plaintiff: Lanita Lytle
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00636
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/13/2020 9:30AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 9/13/2019, ADR Mediation Completed by 1/31/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019, Discovery due by 12/13/2019, Motions due by 12/30/2019,. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lanita Lytle. (Blanchard, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Lanita Lytle. (Blanchard, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) andLocal Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. Failure to do so may result in the Court's entering its own scheduling order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Letter sent to attorney Louis Durbin regarding admission into the Western District of Texas. (bc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by The Hertz Corporation. (Parker, George)
June 7, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
June 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Hertz Corporation.(Parker, George)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Hertz Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12206477), filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hertz Texas Business Filing, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit Bexar Dist. Court Docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lytle v. The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanita Lytle
Represented By: Michael J. Blanchard
Represented By: Gavin H. McInnis
Represented By: Paula A. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: George Harold Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?