Medina v. Delta Air Lines Inc.
Plaintiff: Adella Medina
Defendant: Delta Air Lines Inc. and Corporation Service Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00696
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Anthony Renteria. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/12/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2019, Discovery due by 11/1/2019, Motions due by 1/15/2020,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
July 30, 2019 Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL TO DISREGARD ENTRY AS IT WAS FILED IN ERROR*** re #10 Scheduling Order,. (mgr)
July 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2019, Discovery due by 11/1/2019, (mgr)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/12/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2019, Discovery due by 11/1/2019, Motions due by 1/15/2020,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY -DOCKETED IN ERROR (SEE CORRECITON DOC #9)***SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/12/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2019, Discovery due by 1/15/2019, Motions due by 1/15/2020,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) Modified on 7/30/2019, to edit text (mgr).
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order (Corrected) by Delta Air Lines Inc.. (Anderson, Geffrey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #6 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order (mgr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -DOCUMENT MISSING CASE NUMBER***Proposed Scheduling Order by Delta Air Lines Inc.. (Anderson, Geffrey) Modified on 7/18/2019 (mgr).
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 50050105. (mgr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice from Attorney Joseph Anthony Renteria to represent Adella Medina. (mgr)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. the parties shall submit a proposedscheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to attorney Trey Gordon and Tony Renteria regarding admission into the Western District of Texas. (bc)
June 14, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
June 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12236474), filed by Delta Air Lines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement)(Anderson, Geffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Delta Air Lines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adella Medina
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Renteria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines Inc.
Represented By: Geffrey W. Anderson
Represented By: Kristin Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?