Joshua Garcia v. Sandbox Transportation, LLC
Plaintiff: Joshua Garcia, Chance Clark, Reuben Romero, Robert Maust, Marcus Crowe, Douglas Yandell and Byron Orange
Defendant: Sandbox Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00764
Filed: June 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD against Sandbox Transportation, LLC amending, filed by Marcus Crowe, Robert Maust, Joshua Garcia, Chance Clark, Douglas Yandell, Reuben Romero, Byron Orange.(Clifford, Dennis)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint (Second Amended) by Sandbox Transportation, LLC.(McNitzky, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sandbox Transportation, LLC amending, filed by Joshua Garcia, Chance Clark, Douglas Yandell, Robert Maust, Marcus Crowe.(Clifford, Dennis)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is August 13, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint by Sandbox Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNitzky, Mark)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Garcia, Chance Clark, Douglas Yandell. Sandbox Transportation, LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Clifford, Dennis)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sandbox Transportation, LLC amending, filed by Joshua Garcia, Douglas Yandell, Chance Clark.(Clifford, Dennis)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sandbox Transportation, LLC. (rg)
June 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg)
June 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
June 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joshua Garcia. (Clifford, Dennis)
June 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12295122), filed by Joshua Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clifford, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joshua Garcia v. Sandbox Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandbox Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Burnside
Represented By: Mark A. McNitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Garcia
Represented By: Dennis Alexander Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chance Clark
Represented By: Dennis Alexander Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben Romero
Represented By: Dennis Alexander Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maust
Represented By: Dennis Alexander Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Crowe
Represented By: Dennis Alexander Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Yandell
Represented By: Dennis Alexander Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Orange
Represented By: Dennis Alexander Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?