Encarnacion et al v. Stolze et al
Plaintiff: Eustaquia Encarnacion and Antonio Encarnacion
Defendant: Vilma D. Stolze and Kent E. Stolze
Case Number: 5:2019cv00775
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Vilma D. Stolze. (mgr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Kent E. Stolze. (mgr)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kent E. Stolze, Vilma D. Stolze.(aej)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent E. Stolze, Vilma D. Stolze (aej)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vilma D. Stolze. (aej)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kent E. Stolze. (aej)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Antonio Encarnacion, Eustaquia Encarnacion. (Welmaker, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Antonio Encarnacion, Eustaquia Encarnacion. (Welmaker, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (aej)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12306833), filed by Eustaquia Encarnacion, Antonio Encarnacion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welmaker, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encarnacion et al v. Stolze et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eustaquia Encarnacion
Represented By: Douglas B. Welmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Encarnacion
Represented By: Douglas B. Welmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vilma D. Stolze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent E. Stolze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?