Cook v. GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Zacharias Bryan Cook
Defendant: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00784
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
2 Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for separate trials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs breach of contract claim will be tried first and prior to his extracontractual claims in accordance with Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules ofCivil Procedure. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference reset for 9/12/2019 3:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,),. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, (Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney, Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/10/2019). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney for disposition of all pretrial matters. Signed by Jason K. Pulliam. (rg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 ATTACHMENT Order for Separate Trials to #14 Unopposed MOTION for Separate Trials by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Beckelman, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney William Freeman - Proposed order required with motion. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order using the "Attachment" event located under "Other Documents" from menu and link the proposed order to thisdocument. See page 11, item 9d of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western of District of Texas. re #14 Unopposed MOTION for Separate Trials (rg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - See Deficiency Notice #16. Unopposed MOTION for Separate Trials by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Freeman, William) Modified on 8/14/2019 (rg).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jkda)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Freeman, William)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND ADVISORY - Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
July 8, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of Texas; Case Number 2:19-cv-00136.
July 3, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 7/3/2019, filed. (arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Change Venue to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER; Motion-related deadline set re: #2 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division Response due by 7/1/2019.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by GEICO Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Freeman, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Freeman, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Zacharias Bryan Cook, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2019. (Westlund, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Freeman, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division by GEICO Marine Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freeman, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County Court at Law No. 4, case number 2019CCV-60523-4 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22399800) filed by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freeman, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zacharias Bryan Cook
Represented By: R. Scott Westlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: William Tracy Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?