Pete v. USAA Savings Bank
Plaintiff: Alice Pete
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Case Number: 5:2019cv00798
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION JOINT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR INSPECTING DEFENDANTS PREMISES by Alice Pete. (Sellers, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 27 NON-CONSENT to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge by USAA Savings Bank. (Cook, Nora) Modified on 8/26/2019 (rg).
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Alice Pete. (Sellers, James)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, ( Status Conference & any Pending Motions set for 10/2/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 1/10/2020,, Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2019,, Discovery due by 2/28/2020,, Joinder of Parties due by 11/20/2019,, Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2020,, Jury Selection set for 7/27/2020 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Jury Trial set for 7/27/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 Scheduling Recommendations by Alice Pete. (Sellers, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Alice Pete. (Sellers, James)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (arb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mathew Kidman Higbee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12461172) by on behalf of Alice Pete. (Higbee, Mathew)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Krueger of Nora K. Cook ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12424104) by on behalf of USAA Savings Bank. (Krueger, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Krueger, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by USAA Savings Bank.(Krueger, David)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2019,), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) Modified on 7/24/2019 (wg).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Substitute Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by USAA Savings Bank. (Krueger, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Letter to (Sheri M. Thome) as to USAA Savings Bank. (wg)
July 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
July 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-00309.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division. Plaintiff agrees to the substitution of Defendant USAA Savings Bank by USAA SB's parent company USAA Federal Savings Bank. USAA FSB's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until two weeks after the court enters this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for The Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Thome, Sheri) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #5 Stipulation; Parties shall file another stipulation to transfer venue within ten (10) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Stipulation, 9 Minute Order,, by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Thome, Sheri) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/13/2019 Re: #5 Stipulation. ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR 7-1. Missing Judge's Signature box. Attorney Jennifer Arledge is advised to filed properly formatted Stipulation using the correct event Notice of Corrected Image/Document , pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and properly link newly filed Notice to the appropriate document #5 .(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Sheri M. Thome on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Thome, Sheri) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/1/2019. Under Local Rule 7-2(d), the failure of an opposing party to file points and authorities in response to any motion, except a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 or a motion for attorneys fees, constitutes a consent to granting of the motion. Given that plaintiff has not filed a response to defendant's motion to extend time #6 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to extend time is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GO) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Arledge, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 View Corrected Image #10 as to STIPULATION MOTION to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court of the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division Responses due by 3/29/2019. (Arledge, Jennifer) Modified event on 6/13/2019 (EDS). [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alice Pete re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. USAA Savings Bank served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alice Pete. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USAA Savings Bank re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USAA Savings Bank (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5438941) by Alice Pete. Proof of service due by 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Higbee, Mathew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pete v. USAA Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Pete
Represented By: Mathew Kidman Higbee
Represented By: James A. Sellers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Represented By: Jennifer W. Arledge
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Represented By: Nora K. Cook
Represented By: David M. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?