United of Omaha Life Insurance Company v. Womack-Rodriguez, et al
Plaintiff: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Defendant: James G. Murray, Jr., Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez, Trenton Seth Womack and American Funeral Financial, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00814
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Camie Wade Requests for Production are part of discovery and not filed here in Federal Court. re #17 Request for Production Notice (Other) (rg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - See Deficiency Notice #18. Request for Production Sara Jo Womack's RFP to D Murray by Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez (Wade, Camie) Modified on 8/30/2019 (rg).
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Parties Defendant in Interpleader by James G. Murray, Jr. (Hopson, Margaret)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 Interpleader Defendant James G. Murry Jr.'s First Amended ANSWER to Complaint in Interpleader by James G. Murray, Jr.(Hopson, Margaret)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 Murry Original ANSWER to Complaint in Interpleader. Attorney Margaret Jones Hopson added to party James G. Murray, Jr(pty:dft) by James G. Murray, Jr.(Hopson, Margaret)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez. (Wade, Camie)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. American Funeral Financial, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Nicol, Marjorie)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties by Trenton Seth Womack. (Manning, Judson)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Trenton Seth Womack's ANSWER to Complaint in Interpleader. Attorney Judson Paul Manning added to party Trenton Seth Womack(pty:dft) by Trenton Seth Womack.(Manning, Judson)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties by Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez. (Wade, Camie)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Camie Carlene Wade added to party Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez(pty:dft) by Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez.(Wade, Camie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Nicol, Marjorie)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez. (aej)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Funeral Financial, LLC. (aej)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Nicol, Marjorie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Nicol, Marjorie)
July 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
July 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER AND FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12338399). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A1 - A9)(Nicol, Marjorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company v. Womack-Rodriguez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Margaret Jones Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Jo Womack-Rodriguez
Represented By: Camie Carlene Wade
Represented By: David Leslie Kerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton Seth Womack
Represented By: Judson Paul Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Funeral Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Marjorie C. Nicol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?