Dobson v. Northfield Medical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Dobson
Defendant: Northfield Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00818
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/9/2019,, Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard G. Garza for Brittany A. Bogaerts ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12437995) by on behalf of Northfield Medical, Inc.. (Garza, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 ***DUPLICATE, WRONG ATTY. ON MOTION *** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard G. Garza for Brian V. Alcala ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12437995) by on behalf of Northfield Medical, Inc.. (Garza, Richard) Modified on 8/6/2019 (wg). Modified TEXT on 8/6/2019 (wg).
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard G. Garza for Brian V. Alcala ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12437953) by on behalf of Northfield Medical, Inc.. (Garza, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Northfield Medical, Inc.. (Garza, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Richard G. Garza added to party Northfield Medical, Inc.(pty:dft) by Northfield Medical, Inc..(Garza, Richard)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Northfield Medical, Inc.. (wg)
July 12, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
July 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Steven Dobson. (Sanford, Josh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12342613), filed by Steven Dobson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Josh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobson v. Northfield Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dobson
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Merideth Q. McEntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northfield Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Brian V. Alcala
Represented By: Richard G. Garza
Represented By: Brittany A. Bogaerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?