Bollin v. Davis
Petitioner: Jonathan Bollin and Jonathan Dwight Bollin
Respondent: State of Texas and Lorie Davis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00831
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Jonathan Dwight Bollin. (mgr)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500050626 (mgr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VIOLATIONS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Jonathan Dwight Bollin (mgr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Objection to #3 Deficiency Order by Jonathan Dwight Bollin. (mgr)
July 19, 2019 Mailed IFP Application along with Order (doc #3) to Petitioner. (mgr)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, Petitionermust submit to the Court either the required filing fee of $5.00 or a completed application to proceed IFP.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter by Jonathan Bollin. (mgr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jonathan Bollin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum & Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 envelope)(mgr) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/16/2019) (mgr).
July 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
July 15, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY (mgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollin v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Bollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Dwight Bollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?