Ahmed v. Board of Immigration Appeals
Petitioner: Mohmed Ahmed
Respondent: Board of Immigration Appeals
Case Number: 5:2019cv00833
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Board of Immigration Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (McAndrew, Lacy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Mail Green Card Returned by BIA of #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, (rg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt addressed to the Board of Immigration Appeals of #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and #1 Petition.Copies were also mailed to the U.S. Attorney in San Antonio and U.S. Attorney in Virginia. (rg)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDERED that the U.S. District Clerk: (1) furnish the Office of the U.S. Attorney in San Antonio, Texas, with copies of the Petition (ECF No. 1) and this Order; (2) furnish the Office of the U.S. Attorney in Virginia, with copies of the Petition (ECF No. 1) and this Order; and (3) serve the BIA by certified mail return receipt requested at the following address: 5107 Leesburg Pike, Falls Church, VA 22041. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents must file an answer or response to the Petition within thirty (30) days from the date of service. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mohmed Ahmed. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, filed by Mohmed Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Waiver, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rg)
July 15, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Board of Immigration Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohmed Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Immigration Appeals
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?