Lopez v. Security Service Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Hector Lopez
Defendant: Security Service Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 5:2019cv00844
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hector Lopez as to Security Service Federal Credit Union. Waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Kennard, Alfonso)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to JT Cody on 7/22/19 by Hector Lopez (Kennard, Alfonso)
July 17, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12360877), filed by Hector Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennard, Alfonso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Security Service Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Lopez
Represented By: Alfonso Kennard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Service Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?