Simmons v. Vanguard Resources Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul A. Simmons
Defendant: Vanguard Resources Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00848
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 USM/285'S & Summons forwarded to the US Marshal Service for Issuance as to Vanguard Resources Inc.. (wg)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE TO THE DISTRICT COURT, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service,it is ORDERED that, if not already accomplished, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerks Office a fully completed United States Marshal Service Form 285, including fully complete addresses, for each Defendant required to be served and the United States Marshals Service shall serve each Defendant with a copy of theComplaint and a copy of this order by certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Paul A. Simmons. (wg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 PRO-SE COMPLAINT, filed by Paul A. Simmons.(wg)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING re #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Paul A. Simmons,IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint [#1-1] shall be filed by the Clerk without prepayment of fees, costs or the giving of security therefore, and the Clerk shall, until further Order of this Court, waive the collection of any other fees or costs from Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 21 days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a More Definite Statement of the claims he seeks to present to this Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
July 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
July 23, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis (bc)
July 22, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Chestney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul A. Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bc)
July 16, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
July 16, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Vanguard Resources Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Resources Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?