Flynn v. Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation

Plaintiff: Mark Flynn
Defendant: Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00867
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mark Flynn, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation (Dunlap, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(O'Donnell, Laura)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation, Motions terminated: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation., Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation answer due 8/28/2019.. Signed by Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Laura)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Notices of Consent by Mark Flynn (Josephson, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Flynn. Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Dunlap, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard J. Burch on behalf of Mark Flynn (Burch, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Mark Flynn (Dunlap, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Mark Flynn. Attorney Richard M. Schreiber added to party Mark Flynn(pty:pla) (Schreiber, Richard)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation. (wg)
July 19, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
July 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mark Flynn. (Josephson, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12372517), filed by Mark Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn v. Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez Oil & Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Flynn
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?