Donnelly et al v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Daniel Donnelly and Mary Fox
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Jorge Rodriguez, Thomas LaFleur and Bryan Marquez
Case Number: 5:2019cv00882
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Mary Fox, Plaintiff Daniel Donnelly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cardenas-Colenso, Yesenia)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cardenas-Colenso, Yesenia)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. It is hereby Further Ordered that, on or before September 25, 2019, that the parties first confer as required by FED R. CIV. P. 26(f), and then submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Recommendations to the Court. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge., ( Scheduling and Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Recommendations, #2 Consent)(mgr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER this instant action is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Henry Bemporad for initial pretrial conference and entry of a scheduling order. Signed by Jason K. Pulliam. (rf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Daniel Donnelly, Mary Fox, re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Mary Fox, Plaintiff Daniel Donnelly Plaintiffs' Reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Tracy, Eric)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jkda)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Mary Fox, Plaintiff Daniel Donnelly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cardenas-Colenso, Yesenia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Daniel Donnelly, Mary Fox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A TxDOT Crash Report, #2 Exhibit EX B TxDOT Crash Report Codes, #3 Exhibit EX C TxDOT Report)(Tracy, Eric)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Cardenas-Colenso, Yesenia)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yesenia E. Cardenas-Colenso on behalf of Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. (Cardenas-Colenso, Yesenia)
July 24, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
July 24, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12389334), filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(Viehman, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donnelly et al v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Donnelly
Represented By: Eric Todd Tracy
Represented By: Wendell P. Martens, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew G. Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Fox
Represented By: Eric Todd Tracy
Represented By: Wendell P. Martens, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew G. Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Represented By: J. Karl Viehman
Represented By: Yesenia E. Cardenas-Colenso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas LaFleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?