Cyr et al v. SNH NS MTG Properties 2 Trust
Appellant: Leanne Mary Cyr and Steven Jeffrey Cyr
Appellee: SNH NS MTG Properties 2 Trust
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Not Yet Classified: Christopher H. Mott
Case Number: 5:2019cv00911
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR/Mediation. Christopher H. Mott appointed as Neutral ADR Mediation Completed by 10/31/2019,. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 10/9/2019, (mgr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Referral to ADR/Mediation by Leanne Mary Cyr, Steven Jeffrey Cyr, SNH NS MTG Properties 2 Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Referral to Judicial Mediator and Abatement of Deadlines)(Watts, Jameson)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellants' designated record on appeal is complete. The Appellee has not filed with the bankruptcy clerk a designation of additional items to be included in the record on appeal. The record on appeal is complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellants' Designation of the Record, #2 Dsgn. 1 - Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 Desgn. 2 thru 31, #4 Order Granting Joint Motion to Mediate and Abate Deadlines (No. 250)) (Lawson, Rob) (1 disc marked Exh #37)(Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #5 Exhibits) (rf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #6 Exhibits) (rf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #7 Exhibits) (rf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #8 Exhibits) (rf). Modified on 9/3/2019 (rf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #9 Exhibits) (rf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #10 Exhibits) (rf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #11 Exhibits) (rf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #12 Exhibits) (rf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #13 Exhibits) (rf).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Bankruptcy Court Filing - Agreed Order Granting Stay Pending Appeal. ATTACHMENT to #1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case, (Lawson, Rob)
July 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
July 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #2 List of Parties, #3 LtrTrnNtcDCBK) (tr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyr et al v. SNH NS MTG Properties 2 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Leanne Mary Cyr
Represented By: Eric J. Taube
Represented By: Ronald J. Johnson
Represented By: Mark Curtis Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Steven Jeffrey Cyr
Represented By: Ronald J. Johnson
Represented By: Eric J. Taube
Represented By: Mark Curtis Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SNH NS MTG Properties 2 Trust
Represented By: Jameson Joseph Watts
Represented By: Timothy Paul Ribelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Christopher H. Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?