Padilla v. Davis, et al
Plaintiff: Ismael Padilla
Defendant: Director of Texas Prison System, Greg Abbott, Director of University of Texas Medical Branch, Senior Warden of Connally Unit, Mr. FNU Givens and Lorie Davis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00922
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Case Opening Letter to Ismael Padilla. (mgr)
August 1, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
August 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Case electronically transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-00434.
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Order to Transfer case to Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/12/2019.(Perez, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/1/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 3:19-cv-00057-VAB. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/1/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: For the reasons explained in the attached Order Consolidating Cases, the Court sua sponte ORDERS the consolidation of five cases filed by Mr. Padilla that are currently pending before this Court -- Nos. 3:19-cv-57 (VAB), 3:19-cv-231 (VAB), 3:19-cv-282 (VAB), No. 3:19-cv-434 (VAB), and 3:19-cv-594 (VAB) -- for all purposes, and the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to docket any future filings under the docket number of the lead case only, 3:19-cv-57. See attached Order for full details. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/8/2019. (Baran, Hugh) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/1/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT A re #3 Standing Protective Order filed by Ismael Padilla. (Payton, R.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2019: #1 Envelope) (Payton, R.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/1/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/25/2019.(Reis, Julia) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/1/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/25/2019.(Reis, Julia) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/1/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ismael Padilla. (Reis, Julia) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/1/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against Director of Texas Prison System, Senior Warden of Connally Unit, Director of University of Texas Medical Branch, Greg Abbott, filed by Ismael Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia) Modified on 3/29/2019 to modify party names (Reis, Julia). [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Davis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Texas Prison System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of University of Texas Medical Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Warden of Connally Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. FNU Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?