Robert Johnson v. Admir Secerbegovic, et al
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Defendant: Leonardo Martinez, David E Torres Compean, Yasco Trucking, LLC and Admir Secerbegovic
Case Number: 5:2019cv00923
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
August 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of Texas; Case Number 7:18-cv-00393.
August 1, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 08/01/2019, filed. (klopez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division; (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND AND GRANTING DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS denying #7 MOTION to Remand, granting #3 MOTION to Dismiss , granting #6 MOTION to Dismiss , David E Torres Compean and Leonardo Martinez terminated (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ezmerelda Hernandez by Robert Johnson, filed. (Zavaletta, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Heckter Rodriguez by Robert Johnson, filed. (Zavaletta, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leonardo Martinez by Robert Johnson, filed. (Zavaletta, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David E. Torres Compean by Robert Johnson, filed. (Zavaletta, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Rule 29 Agreement Dated May 17, 2019 by Admir Secerbegovic, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 29 Agreement Dated May 17, 2019)(Lair, R) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING PRIOR ORDERS - Docket numbers 21 and 22 are hereby VACATED. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY Response due within 14 days. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #7 Plaintiff's Objections to Removal and Motion to Remand (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #3 Defendant Torres Compean's MOTION to Dismiss, Plaintiff's negligent entrustment claim against Defendant Compean is DISMISSED. Defendant David E Torres Compean is DISMISSED as a party to this action. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Striking Document re: #17 Initial Disclosures (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 19 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Robert Johnson, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Texas Peace Officer's Crash Report, #2 Exhibit Proper Damage Photographs, #3 Exhibit Incident Report)(Zavaletta, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Admir Secerbegovic, Yasco Trucking, LLC, filed.(Lair, R) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by David E Torres Compean, Leonardo Martinez, filed.(Ortiz, Ray) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 Amended *Certificate of Interested Parties by Admir Secerbegovic, Yasco Trucking, LLC, filed.(Lair, R) *Modified on 2/7/2019 (klopez, 7). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randy Crane. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/6/2019. Case called on docket. Parties present. Status and details of case discussed. The Court announced case will remain on active docket. The Court issued a scheduling order, copies tendered to counsel, reflecting an April 2020 jury trial date. Appearances: Peter M. Zavaletta, Plaintiff; R Matt Lair/Megan Cook, Defendants. (ERO:Adrian De La Rosa), filed.(DeliaRodriguez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2019 Pltf Expert Report due by 1/3/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 1/17/2020. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/21/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/21/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane Jury Selection set for 4/7/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 *CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert Johnson, filed.(Zavaletta, Peter) *Modified on 2/5/2019 (klopez, 7). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Megin Koch on behalf of David E Torres Compean, Leonardo Martinez, filed. (Ortiz, Ray) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by David E Torres Compean, Leonardo Martinez, filed.(Ortiz, Ray) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Plaintiff's Advisory to Court by Robert Johnson, filed. (Zavaletta, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Admir Secerbegovic, Yasco Trucking, LLC, filed.(Lair, R) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Admir Secerbegovic, Yasco Trucking, LLC, filed.(Lair, R) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objection to Removal, filed by Admir Secerbegovic, Yasco Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Notice of Removal and Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Lair, R) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to #1 Notice of Removal, Motion To Remand & Memorandum of Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Robert Johnson. (Zavaletta, Peter) Modified on 2/26/2019 (klopez, 7). Modified on 7/9/2019 (klopez, 7). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Leonardo Martinez, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Ortiz, Ray) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Admir Secerbegovic, Yasco Trucking, LLC, filed.(Lair, R) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Admir Secerbegovic, Yasco Trucking, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue)(Lair, R) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by David E Torres Compean, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Compean's Motion to Dismiss)(Ortiz, Ray) Modified on 2/26/2019 (klopez, 7). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane (by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from hidalgo, case number C-4119-18-H (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21473816) filed by ADMIR SECERBEGOVIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of matters, #2 Exhibit docket sheet, #3 Exhibit state court docs, #4 Exhibit list of counsel, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lair, R) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Johnson v. Admir Secerbegovic, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Represented By: Thomas J. Henry
Represented By: Peter Michael Zavaletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonardo Martinez
Represented By: Ray R. Ortiz
Represented By: Edward J. Batis, Jr.
Represented By: Leslie Megin Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E Torres Compean
Represented By: Ray R. Ortiz
Represented By: Edward J. Batis, Jr.
Represented By: Leslie Megin Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasco Trucking, LLC
Represented By: R. Matt Lair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admir Secerbegovic
Represented By: R. Matt Lair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?