Hill Country Villas Townhome Owners' Association, Inc. v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Hill Country Villas Townhome Owners' Association, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Wysoczan, Cristian Morales and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00936
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Cristian Morales, re #3 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Cristian Morales' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Cristian Morales (Nicoldemus, Jeff)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jkda)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CRISTIAN MORALES RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS by Hill Country Villas Townhome Owners' Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Denying)(Le, Michelle)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, re #4 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Hill Country Villas Townhome Owners' Association, Inc. (Avery, Christopher)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) andLocal Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
September 1, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Hill Country Villas Townhome Owners' Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Le, Michelle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Cristian Morales' Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cristian Morales. (Nicoldemus, Jeff)
August 5, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
August 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to JS44 by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. (Martin, Brian)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12430946), filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Martin, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill Country Villas Townhome Owners' Association, Inc. v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wysoczan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristian Morales
Represented By: Jeff I. Nicoldemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian S. Martin
Represented By: Saira S. Siddiqui
Represented By: Christopher H. Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hill Country Villas Townhome Owners' Association, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle C. Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?