McRae v. American Protections Plans LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leland McRae
Defendant: American Protections Plans LLC and John and/or Jane Does
Guardian Ad Litem: Attorney Justin B Kaplan
Case Number: 5:2019cv00945
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
September 20, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT "Justin B. Kaplan" HAS BEEN REMOVED AS A FILER OF THIS DOCUMENT**** re #9 Answer to Complaint. (rf)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Protections Plans LLC.(Kaplan, Justin) Modified on 9/20/2019, to correct filers (rf).
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Justin B. Kaplan; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500050837. (aej)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; All Defendants. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Justin B Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Kaplan, Justin)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin B. Kaplan on behalf of American Protections Plans LLC, Justin B Kaplan. Attorney Justin B. Kaplan added to party Justin B Kaplan(pty:adlit) (Kaplan, Justin)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sd)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Protections Plans LLC. (aej)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Protections Plans LLC. (aej)
August 6, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
August 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leland McRae. Request for Summons (McRae, Leland)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Initial Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12440682), filed by Leland McRae. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McRae, Leland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRae v. American Protections Plans LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland McRae
Represented By: Leland Garrett McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Protections Plans LLC
Represented By: Justin B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Guardian ad litem: Attorney Justin B Kaplan
Represented By: Justin B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?