George Richardson, et al v. Texas Secretary of State, et al
Plaintiff: American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Weisfeld Rosalie, Austin Justice Coalition, League of Women Voters of Texas, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, Dr. George Richardson, MOVE Texas Civic Fund and Rosalie Weisfeld
Defendant: Perla Lara, Trudy Hancock and Texas Secretary of State
Case Number: 5:2019cv00963
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) by Trudy Hancock. (Magee, Jason)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendant Perla Lara, in her official capacity as City of McAllen, Texas Secretarys Motion to Dismiss is extended to October 21, 2019 entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond)(Dolling, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Perla Lara. (Heath, Claude)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Isaac J. Tawil. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Austin W. Stevenson. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 30, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Claude Robert Heath on behalf of Isaac J. Tawil ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12549121) by on behalf of Perla Lara. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heath, Claude)
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Claude Robert Heath on behalf of Austin W. Stevenson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12549102) by on behalf of Perla Lara. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heath, Claude)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Rosalie Weisfeld, League of Women Voters of Texas, George Richardson, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, Austin Justice Coalition as to Trudy Hancock. Waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Mirza, Hani)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Zachary Dolling; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500050693. (rg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Garrett Johnston; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500050656. (rg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Jennifer J. Hardy; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500050657. (rg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Denis A. Fallon; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500050658. (rg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Audra White; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500050659. (rg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Richard Mancino; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500050661. (rg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by P. Maxwell Griffith; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500050662. (rg)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Mancino. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that if he has not already done so, shall immediately tender to the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2) entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for P. Maxwell Griffith. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that if he has not already done so, shall immediately tender to the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2).entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer J. Hardy. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that if she has not already done so, shall immediately tender to the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2) entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Garrett Johnston. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that if he has not already done so, shall immediately tender to the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2) entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) Modified on 8/15/2019 (ju).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Denis A. Fallon. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that if he has not already done so, shall immediately tender to the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2).entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Audra White. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that if she has not already done so, shall immediately tender to the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2) entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Rosalie Weisfeld, League of Women Voters of Texas, George Richardson, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, Austin Justice Coalition as to Texas Secretary of State. Waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Mirza, Hani)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hani Mirza for R. Mancino by on behalf of American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirza, Hani)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hani Mirza for P. M. Griffith by on behalf of American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirza, Hani)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hani Mirza for J. Hardy by on behalf of American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirza, Hani)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hani Mirza for G. Johnston by on behalf of American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirza, Hani)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hani Mirza for D. A. Fallon by on behalf of American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirza, Hani)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hani Mirza for A. White by on behalf of American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirza, Hani)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zach Dolling. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if he has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00 made payable to the Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(2) entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Rosalie Weisfeld, League of Women Voters of Texas, George Richardson, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, Austin Justice Coalition. Perla Lara served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (Mirza, Hani)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hani Mirza for Zach Dolling by on behalf of American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirza, Hani)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Texas Secretary of State. (rg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Trudy Hancock. (rg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Perla Lara. (rg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Mirza, Hani)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Mirza, Hani)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., Austin Justice Coalition, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, George Richardson, Rosalie Weisfeld. (Mirza, Hani)
August 7, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
August 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12446570). No Summons requested at this time, filed by American GI Forum of Texas, Inc., MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Weisfeld Rosalie, League of Women Voters of Texas, George Richardson, Coalition of Texans with Disabilities, Austin Justice Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirza, Hani) Modified on 8/7/2019 to add receipt number(tr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Richardson, et al v. Texas Secretary of State, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American GI Forum of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Hani Mirza
Represented By: Zachary Dolling
Represented By: Garrett Johnston
Represented By: Audra White
Represented By: Ryan V. Cox
Represented By: Denis A. Fallon
Represented By: Jennifer J. Hardy
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: P. Maxwell Griffith
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weisfeld Rosalie
Represented By: Hani Mirza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Justice Coalition
Represented By: Hani Mirza
Represented By: Zachary Dolling
Represented By: Garrett Johnston
Represented By: Audra White
Represented By: Ryan V. Cox
Represented By: Denis A. Fallon
Represented By: Jennifer J. Hardy
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: P. Maxwell Griffith
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Texas
Represented By: Hani Mirza
Represented By: Zachary Dolling
Represented By: Garrett Johnston
Represented By: Audra White
Represented By: Ryan V. Cox
Represented By: Denis A. Fallon
Represented By: Jennifer J. Hardy
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: P. Maxwell Griffith
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition of Texans with Disabilities
Represented By: Hani Mirza
Represented By: Zachary Dolling
Represented By: Garrett Johnston
Represented By: Audra White
Represented By: Ryan V. Cox
Represented By: Denis A. Fallon
Represented By: Jennifer J. Hardy
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: P. Maxwell Griffith
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. George Richardson
Represented By: Hani Mirza
Represented By: Zachary Dolling
Represented By: Garrett Johnston
Represented By: Audra White
Represented By: Ryan V. Cox
Represented By: Denis A. Fallon
Represented By: Jennifer J. Hardy
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: P. Maxwell Griffith
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOVE Texas Civic Fund
Represented By: Hani Mirza
Represented By: Zachary Dolling
Represented By: Garrett Johnston
Represented By: Audra White
Represented By: Ryan V. Cox
Represented By: Denis A. Fallon
Represented By: Jennifer J. Hardy
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: P. Maxwell Griffith
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Weisfeld
Represented By: Hani Mirza
Represented By: Zachary Dolling
Represented By: Garrett Johnston
Represented By: Audra White
Represented By: Ryan V. Cox
Represented By: Denis A. Fallon
Represented By: Jennifer J. Hardy
Represented By: Mimi M.D. Marziani
Represented By: P. Maxwell Griffith
Represented By: Rebecca E. Harrison Stevens
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perla Lara
Represented By: Isaac J. Tawil
Represented By: Claude Robert Heath
Represented By: Austin W. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy Hancock
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?