Ramirez Ramirez v. McAleenan et al
Petitioner: Jose Alberto Ramirez Ramirez
Respondent: Matthew Albence, United States Department of Homeland Security, Daniel Bible, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts and Reynaldo Castro
Case Number: 5:2019cv00982
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Petitioner and by United States Department of Homeland Security. (Lowry, Faith)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Albence, Daniel Bible, Reynaldo Castro, Kevin McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Lowry, Faith)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt returned as delivered of #4 Order (mgr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail returned as delivered of #4 Order (mgr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Order (mgr)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jose Alberto Ramirez Ramirez. (fs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jose Alberto Ramirez Ramirez. (fs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5; receipt number 500050526), filed by Jose Alberto Ramirez Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt Copy)(fs)
August 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (fs)
August 13, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (fs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez Ramirez v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Alberto Ramirez Ramirez
Represented By: Francisco Javier Alvillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael J. Pitts
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reynaldo Castro
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?