Maxey v. Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Dameion Ray Maxey
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00986
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Summers, Monica)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (McInnis, Walter)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL MATTERS AND PENDING MOTIONS Scheduling. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/9/2019,), ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
August 14, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Summers, Monica)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12476051), filed by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(McInnis, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxey v. Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Walter L. McInnis
Represented By: Monica Lizette Summers
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameion Ray Maxey
Represented By: Gregory T. Van Cleave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?