Tango Delta Financial, Inc. et al v. Lowe
Appellant: Cottingham Management Company, LLC, Tango Delta Financial, Inc. and Cottingham Apex Texas Fund, LLC
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Appellee: John Patrick Lowe
In Re: Dickinson of San Antonio, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01011
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 10/25/2019, (mgr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellee's designation of additional items to be included in the record on appeal is COMPLETE. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of the ROA, #2 Designated Documents) (Lawson, Rob)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellants' designated record on appeal is COMPLETE. Please note that the Appellants listed as part if its record on appeal transcripts from hearings held on 5/1/2019 and 8/5/2019. However, transcripts from those hearings were never ordered as required by FRBP 8009(b) by the Appellants and are therefore not part of the bankruptcy record. (Attachments: #1 Appellants' Designation of the Record on Appeal, #2 Designated Documents, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Lawson, Rob)
August 20, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
August 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #2 List of Parties, #3 LtrTrnNtcDCAP) (tr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tango Delta Financial, Inc. et al v. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cottingham Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Alan Vanderhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tango Delta Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Vanderhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cottingham Apex Texas Fund, LLC
Represented By: Alan Vanderhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Patrick Lowe
Represented By: Randall A. Pulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Dickinson of San Antonio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?