Jorge L. Quintana, Sr. v. John Patrick Lowe
Appellee: John Patrick Lowe
Appellant: Jorge Luis Quintana, Sr. and Jorge L. Quintana, Sr.
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
In Re: Libertad Quintana
Case Number: 5:2019cv01014
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND JUDGMENT - ORDERED that the above numbered bankruptcy appeal is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with procedural rules and/or failure to prosecute. Motions pending with the Court, if any, are Dismissed as Moot and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Jorge L. Quintana, Sr. ORDERED that, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, appellants shall (1) file a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal, (2) file astatement of the issues, and (3) show good cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Bankruptcy Rule 8009 when filing the appeal. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Complete - The Appellant has not filed with the Bankruptcy Clerk a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented as required by Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(a). (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #2 Order Denying Application to Waive Appeal Filing Fee) (Lawson, Rob)
August 21, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg)
August 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 List of Parties, #4 LtrTRnNtcDCBK) (tr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (rg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorge L. Quintana, Sr. v. John Patrick Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Patrick Lowe
Represented By: John Patrick Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jorge Luis Quintana, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jorge L. Quintana, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Libertad Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?