TTG Electric Company, Inc. v. Solis Constructors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: TTG Electric Company, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Solis Constructors, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01032
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Solis Constructors, Inc. answer due 11/15/2019; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 11/15/2019. (rf)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The extension is to on/before November 15, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ar)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by TTG Electric Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beck, Bethany)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TTG Electric Company, Inc.. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Solis Constructors, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (mgr)
August 26, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
August 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TTG Electric Company, Inc.. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TTG Electric Company, Inc.. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12526479), filed by TTG Electric Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Bethany Faith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TTG Electric Company, Inc. v. Solis Constructors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TTG Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Faith Nelson Thompson
Represented By: Thomas J. Walthall, Jr.
Represented By: Bethany Faith Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solis Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?