Mires v. Haven for Hope of Bexar County et al
Plaintiff: Richard Mires
Defendant: Wallace Rich, Haven for Hope of Bexar County and Jerald Martin
Case Number: 5:2019cv01045
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Mires as to Wallace Rich. Waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Fletcher, Melissa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Mires as to Jerald Martin. Waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Fletcher, Melissa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Mires as to Haven for Hope of Bexar County. Waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Fletcher, Melissa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Richard Mires.(Fletcher, Melissa)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wallace Rich. (aej)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jerald Martin. (aej)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Haven for Hope of Bexar County. (aej)
August 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
August 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Richard Mires. (1) Haven for Hope of Bexar County; (2) Wallace Rich; and (3) Jerald Martin (Fletcher, Melissa)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12541888), filed by Richard Mires. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fletcher, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mires v. Haven for Hope of Bexar County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Rich
Represented By: Justin James Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haven for Hope of Bexar County
Represented By: Justin James Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald Martin
Represented By: Justin James Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mires
Represented By: Melissa Morales Fletcher
Represented By: Allison Sarah Hartry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?