Broadcast Music, Inc., et al v. LD Lift, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Inc., Welsh Witch Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Peer International Corporation, Brujo Music, The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Period Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, Forthefallen Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Zombies Ate My Publishing, Red Sea Songs, Ricks Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Reservoir One America and Dandelion Music Co.
Defendant: Kevin La Garza, LD Lift, Inc. and Jeff Slaughter
Case Number: 5:2019cv01046
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; LD Lift, Inc. answer due 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by LD Lift, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hyman, Leslie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. LD Lift, Inc. served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Hawkins, Myall) Modified on 10/3/2019, to edit text (mgr).
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LD Lift, Inc., Kevin La Garza, Jeff Slaughter. (mgr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (mgr)
August 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
August 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Broadcast Music, Inc., Brujo Music, Dandelion Music Co., E.O. Smith Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Forthefallen Publishing, Peer International Corporation, Period Music, Red Sea Songs, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Ricks Music, Inc., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Welsh Witch Music, Zombies Ate My Publishing. (Hawkins, Myall)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12543237), filed by Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, Period Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Brujo Music, Zombies Ate My Publishing, Red Sea Songs, Welsh Witch Music, Dandelion Music Co., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., E.O. Smith Music, Forthefallen Publishing, Reservoir Media Management Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Peer International Corporation, Ricks Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawkins, Myall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc., et al v. LD Lift, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Inc.
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peer International Corporation
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brujo Music
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bernard Edwards Company LLC
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Period Music
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forthefallen Publishing
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O. Smith Music
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zombies Ate My Publishing
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Sea Songs
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricks Music, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp.
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir One America
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dandelion Music Co.
Represented By: Myall S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin La Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LD Lift, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?