Solutions Shared Services v. Michael Jimenez, et al
Plaintiff: Solutions Shared Services
Defendant: Glasheen, Valles & Inderman, LLP and Michael Jimenez
Case Number: 5:2019cv01054
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Solutions Shared Services. (Woody, Ryan)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order and Advisory - Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Jonathon Clark added to party Glasheen, Valles & Inderman, LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathon Clark added to party Michael Jimenez(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Solutions Shared Services by Glasheen, Valles & Inderman, LLP, Michael Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2016 Form 5500, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2017 Form 5500)(Clark, Jonathon)
October 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Glasheen, Valles & Inderman, LLP answer due 10/24/2019; Michael Jimenez answer due 10/24/2019. (rg)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for the Defendants to file an Answer in this matter is extended to October 24, 2019 entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Solutions Shared Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Answer Deadlines)(Dowie, Catherine)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Catherine Dowie. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Woody. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solutions Shared Services. Michael Jimenez served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Busenlener, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solutions Shared Services. Glasheen, Valles & Inderman, LLP served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Busenlener, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James T. Busenlener ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12637680) by on behalf of Solutions Shared Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busenlener, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James T. Busenlener ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12637644) by on behalf of Solutions Shared Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busenlener, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Glasheen, Valles & Inderman, LLP. (rg)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Jimenez. (rg)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Solutions Shared Services. (Busenlener, James)
August 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
August 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12549415). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Solutions Shared Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Busenlener, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solutions Shared Services v. Michael Jimenez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glasheen, Valles & Inderman, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solutions Shared Services
Represented By: James T. Busenlener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?