Jimenez v. First Western Title Acquisition, LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Jimenez
Defendant: First Western Title Acquisition, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01055
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2020 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 7/13/2020 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/11/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2019, Discovery due by 3/6/2020, and Motions due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc)
October 8, 2019 Notice of Correction:**NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS EDITED TO ADD A FILER** re #6 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. (bc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Scheduling Order/Recommendations by Elizabeth Jimenez and First Western Title Acquisition (Galo, Michael) Modified on 10/8/2019 Edited to add Filer (bc).
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by First Western Title Acquisition, LLC. (Lamberson, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth Jimenez. (Galo, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by First Western Title Acquisition, LLC. (Coles, Michael)
August 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
August 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Western Title Acquisition, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12549531), filed by First Western Title Acquisition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coles, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. First Western Title Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Western Title Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Aten Lamberson
Represented By: Michael E. Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Jimenez
Represented By: Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?