Cantu v. Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Cantu and Lauren E. Cantu
Defendant: Williams A. Ted, Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC and Ted A. Williams
Case Number: 5:2019cv01067
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 1/17/2020,, Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2019,, Discovery due by 6/1/2020,, Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2019,, Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2020,, Jury Selection set for 9/28/2020 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties by Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC. (Law, Jonathan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties /Disclosure Statement by Lauren E. Cantu. (Smith, Langdon)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order by Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC. (Law, Jonathan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC. (Law, Jonathan)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/20/2019,), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Amended NOTICE of Removal by Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Law, Jonathan)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2019, Defendant Wilkens Trucking LLC is therefore ordered to file an amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship of the parties so that the Court may determine whether there is complete diversity,no later than September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to attorney Michael Gomez regarding admission into the Western District of Texas. (bc)
September 4, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
September 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC. (Law, Jonathan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12563599), filed by Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Law, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantu v. Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren E. Cantu
Represented By: Langdon Milton Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams A. Ted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Wilkens Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?