Lewis v. U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC., PRIME MORTGAGE TRUST, CERTIFICATES, SERIES, 2006-1 et al
Plaintiff: Traci Lewis
Defendant: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC., PRIME MORTGAGE TRUST, CERTIFICATES, SERIES, 2006-1 and SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01078
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RESETTING TIME OF HEARING, ( Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,), ( Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 11/9/2019,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consent/Non-Consent)(wg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 6, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
September 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC., PRIME MORTGAGE TRUST, CERTIFICATES, SERIES, 2006-1 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12575437), filed by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC., PRIME MORTGAGE TRUST, CERTIFICATES, SERIES, 2006-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheppard, Branch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC., PRIME MORTGAGE TRUST, CERTIFICATES, SERIES, 2006-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Lewis
Represented By: E. Jason Billick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC., PRIME MORTGAGE TRUST, CERTIFICATES, SERIES, 2006-1
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Represented By: Mark M. Appling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Represented By: Mark M. Appling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?