Hopkins v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Virgil W Hopkins
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2019cv01106
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Matthews, Melissa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Questions in Order Regarding Pretrial Matters and Non-Dispositive Pending Motions to #13 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Matthews, Melissa)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth C. Helm for C R Bard Incorporated. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Elizabeth C. Helm ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12707804) by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INTIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/7/2019,, Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2019 3:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(mgr)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Virgil W Hopkins.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500051245. (mgr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jkda)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) andLocal Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
September 12, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
September 12, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Matthews, Melissa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03302.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Texas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03302-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16931677 filed by Virgil W Hopkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil W Hopkins
Represented By: David May
Represented By: David K. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?