Mucu v. Thompson et al
Petitioner: Lucy Angelica Caal Mucu
Respondent: Melissa de Leon and Rose Thompson
Case Number: 5:2019cv01142
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Rose Thompson, Melissa de Leon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McAndrew, Lacy)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge David A. Ezra. Respondent's responsive pleading is due on or before November 15, 2019.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmj)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Rose Thompson, Melissa de Leon. (McAndrew, Lacy)
October 9, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
October 9, 2019 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt #7012 2920 0001 7999 9702 addressed to John F. Paniszczyn of #3 Order (rg)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Lucy Angelica Caal Mucu. (dtg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00; receipt number 500051027), filed by Lucy Angelica Caal Mucu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
September 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
September 20, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mucu v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa de Leon
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Represented By: Noah M. Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rose Thompson
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Represented By: Noah M. Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lucy Angelica Caal Mucu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?