HJD Capital Electric, Inc. v. United States Department of the Air Force, et al
Plaintiff: HJD Capital Electric, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense, United States Department of the Air Force and United States Department of the Army
Case Number: 5:2019cv01196
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT Stipulation of Dismissal by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Richard, Jana)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING, ( Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/12/2019 1:30 PM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Continue entered by Judge David A. Ezra. A order resetting the hearing will follow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ps)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue hearing on Temporary Injuction by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Continuance - TI hearing Nov 5)(Richard, Jana)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Hearing on #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 09:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Defense, United States Department of the Air Force, United States Department of the Army, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mgr)
October 7, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
October 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Richard, Jana)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Richard, Jana)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12695646), filed by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richard, Jana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HJD Capital Electric, Inc. v. United States Department of the Air Force, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HJD Capital Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Jana Marie Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense
Represented By: Jana Marie Richard
Represented By: Kristina Scurry Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Air Force
Represented By: Kristina Scurry Baehr
Represented By: Jana Marie Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: Jana Marie Richard
Represented By: Kristina Scurry Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?